THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:43:34 AM
Lui, Kim Choy
CPSO#:
68741
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
19 Dec 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Apr 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kim C. Lui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2012
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1997 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1997 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 24 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 02 Oct 2010 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 19 Dec 2011 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Dec 2011
Summary:
On December 19, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kim Choy Lui committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
During the gynecological portion of a physical examination, Dr. Lui touched Patient A's vagina in a manner that was sexual in nature, began to lick Patient A's genital area, including her clitoris, and made inappropriate comments to Patient A. During the appointment, Dr. Lui disclosed details about his personal life to Patient A. Following the appointment, he contacted Patient A and continued to disclose personal details to her.
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
1. the Registrar revoke Dr. Lui's certificate of registration, effective at 11:59 p.m. on December 19, 2011.
2. Dr. Lui appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. Dr. Lui reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College by January 19, 2012, in the amount of $16,060.00.
4. Dr. Lui shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount of $3,650.00.
5. the results of this proceeding be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 19, 2011