THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:46:19 AM
Iskander, John Wilson
CPSO#:
68734
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Khartoum, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
203-40 Hillside Dr
Georgetown ON L7G 4W3
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. John W. Iskander Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN WILSON ISKANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISKANDER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2000 |