THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:55:08 PM
Fargher, Terence Jefferson
CPSO#:
68703
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
20 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Mar 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Terence Fargher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Department of internal medicine
Office of Dr Kallie Stapleton
West Parry Sound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound
Ontario
P2A3A4
Date Received: 16 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Mar 1995 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jun 2022 |