THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 21:13:56 PM
Shamisa, Abdalla Rahuma Mabruk
CPSO#:
68700
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jul 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1100 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON N9A 1C9
Phone: 5199738771
Fax: 5199734690
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:08 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDALLA RAHUMA MABRUK SHAMISA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAMISA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 Mar 1995 to 27 Mar 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 28 Mar 1996 to 27 Mar 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 28 Mar 1997 to 27 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 28 Mar 1998 to 27 Mar 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 28 Mar 1999 to 27 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jul 2001 |