THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:38:17 AM
Cooper, Andrew Brent
CPSO#:
68674
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jan 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Dec 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
S2-508, 2100 Bovaird Dr E.
Brampton ON L6R3J7
Phone: (905) 494 2120 Ext. 58439
Fax: 866 580 8965
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:07 Nov 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREW BRENT COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 13 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Dec 1996 |