THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:30:37 PM
Ammura, Ibtesam Ali
CPSO#:
68671
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
09 Aug 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jun 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:02 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Mar 1996
Resident 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 15 Feb 1997
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 16 Feb 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Mar 1998
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Mar 1999
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Apr 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Research Fellows - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Apr 2000
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Apr 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 2002 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2023 |