THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:49:24 PM
Eddeb, Abdurrahman Ali
CPSO#:
68659
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Jun 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jun 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 63111
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDURRAHMAN ALI EDDEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDDEB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 08 Jun 2000
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 2000 |