THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 14:42:34 PM
Monge, Juan Carlos
CPSO#:
68658
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jul 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jul 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Costa Rica, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiology
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5462
Fax: (416) 864-5974
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: JC Monge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2022
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Nov 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JUAN CARLOS MONGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MONGE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Jul 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 1997 |