THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 0:52:02 AM
Moyo, Margaret Sifuma
CPSO#:
68651
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Mar 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Nairobi, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 9
695 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON N1R 7J9
Phone: (519) 620-9444
Fax: (519) 620-0450
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cambridge Memorial Hospital |
Cambridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:31 Dec 1994 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARGARET SIFUMA MOYO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOYO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Sep 1995
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 1995 |