THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:10:55 AM
Chaparro Mutis, Blanca Cecilia
CPSO#:
68585
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Jan 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Juan N. Corpas, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Newfoundland and Labrador
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Respirology |
Effective:05 Jan 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 09 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Aug 1996
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Respiratory Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Oct 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Oct 1997 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Aug 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jun 2013 |
|
Active |