THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:38:47 PM
Shetty, Geeta Rathnakar
CPSO#:
68553
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Mar 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Mar 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Marathi, Tulu
Education: University of Bombay, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Niagara Health St.Catherine's Site
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 45561
Fax: 905 323 7562
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Dec 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEETA RATHNAKAR SHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETTY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Mar 1997 |