THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:59:35 PM
King, George Wilson
CPSO#:
68536
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Phone: (613) 632-1111
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital |
Hawkesbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GEORGE WILSON KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Sep 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
CF - Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 1999 to 03 Jan 2000
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 1999 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 1999 |