THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:27:11 PM
Jassal, Sarbjit Vanita
CPSO#:
68530
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Division of Nephrology
University Health Network
8Nu-857
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3196
Fax: (416) 340-4999
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:03 Feb 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SARBJIT VANITA JASSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASSAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Jun 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Jun 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2001 |