THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:27:12 AM
Lee, Clive Chun Man
CPSO#:
68522
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Oct 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: University of London, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga ON L5N 5S3
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Fax: (905) 816-9833
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CLIVE CHUN MAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 25 Aug 1994 to 19 Oct 1994
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 09 Feb 1995 to 08 Mar 1995
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 23 Aug 1995
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Oct 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Mar 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Aug 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1996 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 1996 |