THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:03:47 AM
Salvadori, Marina Ines
CPSO#:
68488
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Feb 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Agency of Canada
130 Colonnade Road
Ottawa ON K2E 1B6
Phone: 519-433-0821
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:09 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARINA INES SALVADORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALVADORI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Aug 1994 to 26 Aug 1994
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 02 Sep 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 03 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Pediatrics
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
CF - Paediatric Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Aug 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 1996 |