THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:52:48 AM
MacRae, Helen Marie
CPSO#:
68485
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jul 1994
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
301-40 Holly St
Holly Street Clinic
Toronto ON M4S 3C3
Phone: 416-486-8088
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:08 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HELEN MARIE MACRAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACRAE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
CF - Colorectal Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jul 1994 |