THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:00:33 PM
Baine, Sherri Dawn
CPSO#:
68476
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Dec 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: McMaster University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 250-5000
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Dec 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERRI DAWN BAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAINE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 25 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 20 Aug 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 20 Aug 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 20 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 21 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 13 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 14 Dec 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 1998 |