THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:46:20 AM
Connors, Sean Patrick
CPSO#:
68460
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1995
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
General Hospital
Health Sciences Centre
300 Prince Philip Drive
St John's NL A1B 3V6
Phone: (709) 777-6487
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Newfoundland and Labrador
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SEAN PATRICK CONNORS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNORS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 11 Jul 1994 to 07 Aug 1994
EL - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 05 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
CF - Cardiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Aug 1994 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1996 |