THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 22:08:29 PM
Shetty, Rathnakar Bellampalli
CPSO#:
68408
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Mar 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Kannada, Tulu
Education: Mysore University, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Records Management
1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Toll Free 1 800 775 0093
Fax 1 647 933 2904
[email protected]. / www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 19 Nov 2020
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
13 - 1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 30 Oct 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 1997 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2020 |