THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 13:35:49 PM
Al-Hesayen, Abdurrahman Omar Sulaiman
CPSO#:
68401
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Room 6 036 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5399
Fax: (416) 864-5416
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:13 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDURRAHMAN OMAR SULAIMAN AL-HESAYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HESAYEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 06 Jul 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 07 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Cardiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2003 |