THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 16:01:49 PM
Atwal, Rajinder Kaur
CPSO#:
68391
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Oct 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Oct 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Nagra, Rajinder Kaur (used until: 28 Nov 2002 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Calgary, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Bathurst Walk-In Clinic
and Family Practice
Suite 101
4430 Bathurst Street
North York ON M3H 3S3
Phone: (416) 633-3629
Fax: (416) 633-3624
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJINDER KAUR ATWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 1996 |