THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 2:34:38 AM
Manolopoulos, Vaselios
CPSO#:
68365
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Aug 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
33 City Centre Drive, Ste 420
Mississauga ON L5B 2N5
Phone: (905) 608-1444
Fax: (905) 828-5136
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VASELIOS MANOLOPOULOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANOLOPOULOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 2001 |