THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:47:19 AM
Eshleman, Paul Lawrence
CPSO#:
68319
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
14 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
05 Feb 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Paul Eshleman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 24 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:17 Nov 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1998 to 14 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1995 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1995 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2001 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2014 |