THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:49:16 AM
Schachter, Joyce
CPSO#:
68284
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Mar 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
152 Cleopatra Drive
Ottawa ON K2G 5X2
Phone: (613) 728-5863
Fax: (613) 728-4745
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Jul 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOYCE SCHACHTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHACHTER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 1999 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Mar 2020 |