THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:09:16 PM
Prowse, Owen Alexander
CPSO#:
68283
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Feb 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Feb 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Centre Building
Suite 105
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 346-1440
Fax: (807) 346-1445
Electoral District: 09
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Virginia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:27 May 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OWEN ALEXANDER PROWSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PROWSE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2002 |