THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 18:45:14 PM
Staab, Randolf Albert
CPSO#:
68274
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Dec 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Dec 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2000 Credit Valley Rd
Unit #202
Mississauga ON L5M 4N4
Phone: 289-997-1005
Fax: 289-997-8088
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RANDOLF ALBERT STAAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAAB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1999 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Dec 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 1999 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: May 31, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Randolf Staab was charged with the following offences:
1. Sexual Assault, on or about August 3, 2019, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Assault, on or about November 29, 2020, contrary to Section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: March 9, 2022
Place of Charge: City of Brampton
Peel Regional Police
Source:
Other
Active Date: May 31, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On March 1, 2022, the following Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) were imposed on Randolf Staab:
1. Must notify the Police within 48 hours of any change of address, employment.
2. Must not communicate directly or indirectly with named people except in accordance with specified conditions.
3. Must not go to a named place except in accordance with specified conditions.
4. Must not enter the areas where named person is known to be.
5. Must not possess a firearm, crossbow, prohibited weapon, restricted weapon, prohibited device, ammunition, prohibited ammunition or explosive substance, and must surrender those that are already in their possession and also any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling them to acquire or possess them to Police.