THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:42:08 AM
Gollob, Michael Howard
CPSO#:
68262
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Apr 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Apr 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 3 GW 560
Gerrard Wing - Cardiac Centre
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4282
Fax: (416) 340-3281
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL HOWARD GOLLOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLLOB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1997 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Apr 2004 |