THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 5:01:05 AM
Attwood, David George
CPSO#:
68259
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Hospital
Schizophrenia Program
3rd Floor
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 7020
Fax: (613) 798-2971
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID GEORGE ATTWOOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ATTWOOD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2000 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2011 |