THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 5:08:23 AM
Bardana, Davide Domenico
CPSO#:
68252
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 May 2002
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 May 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian
Education: University of Calgary, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Surgery
76 Stuart Street, Watkins 3
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6333
Fax: (613) 548-1336
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVIDE DOMENICO BARDANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARDANA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2002 |