THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 6:25:57 AM
Baig, Mirza Naseeruddin
CPSO#:
68242
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Saskatchewan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIRZA NASEERUDDIN BAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |