THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:45:55 PM
Campeau, Denise Lynne
CPSO#:
68241
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Jun 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Parkinson, Denise Lynne (used until: 26 Sep 1999 )
Campeau, Denise Lynne (used until: 15 Oct 1995 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 16
235 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON L2W 1A5
Phone: (905) 397-7716
Fax: (905) 397-7028
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Dec 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DENISE LYNNE CAMPEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPEAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1996 |