THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 13:52:00 PM
Jhawar, Balraj Singh
CPSO#:
68237
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300-1100 Ouellette Ave
Suite 300
Windsor ON N9A 1C9
Phone: 5199738771
Electoral District: 01
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:31 Dec 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BALRAJ SINGH JHAWAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JHAWAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2004 |