THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:36:48 PM
Macdonald, John Charles
CPSO#:
68234
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Rd
Ottawa ON K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:15 Dec 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN CHARLES MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2003 to 14 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2004 to 14 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2005 to 14 Jan 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1996 |