THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:41:54 AM
Wyman, Roy Jeffrey
CPSO#:
68219
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jul 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 469-6464
Fax: (416) 469-6164
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Providence Health Care,Toronto |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:29 Oct 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROY JEFFREY WYMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1996 |