THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:39:45 AM
Zajc-Dalcourt, Natasha
CPSO#:
68215
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Zajc, Natasha (used until: 25 Jan 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
531 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 6P5
Electoral District: 05
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Zajc-Dalcourt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 1 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Medical records of deceased patients or those who have transferred prior to my office closure (2020) are at 65 Sherwood Glen, Holland Landing, ON L9N 1R3
Medical records of active patients were transferred into the care of Dr. Arya Motaghi at 535 Mulock Drive, Suite 102, Newmarket, ON L3Y 5H2
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1996 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2022 |