THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:40:31 PM
Taylor, Roger Michael
CPSO#:
68199
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: R. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 18 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1999 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1999 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Jun 2021 |