THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:54:23 AM
Lee, Ambrose Wai-Man
CPSO#:
68183
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Queen's University, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 111
955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 303-0883
Fax: (905) 303-0338
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Southlake Regional Health Centre |
Newmarket |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:01 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:22 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AMBROSE WAI-MAN LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Queen's University, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 May 2005
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Mar 1997 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2009 |