THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 22:40:52 PM
Shafai-Sarshar, Roshan
CPSO#:
68158
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Dec 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Shafai, Roshan Sarshar (used until: 15 Dec 1998 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
10 Trench St
Mackenzie Health
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital |
Uxbridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Nov 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROSHAN SHAFAI-SARSHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAFAI-SARSHAR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1997 to 30 Nov 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 1998 |