THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 17:29:07 PM
Raman, Mani
CPSO#:
68154
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Dec 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
312 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON L4B 1A5
Phone: (905) 889-2005
Fax: (905) 889-2006
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MANI RAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1999 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2021 |