THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:30:50 AM
Joo, Daisy Therese
CPSO#:
68148
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Sep 2001
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Sep 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ip, Daisy Therese (used until: 28 Jun 1999 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
NorthYork General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: (416) 756-6582
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 Aug 2001 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAISY THERESE JOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2001 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2001 |