THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:36:44 AM
Pham, Chien Vu
CPSO#:
68124
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jan 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jan 1997
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Vietnamese
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
796 Burnhampthorpe Road West,
Unit 2
Mississauga ON L5C 2R9
Phone: (905) 270-6454
Fax: (905) 270-6460
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:20 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHIEN VU PHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHAM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 1997 |