THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:42:54 PM
Lad, Rameeta Jane
CPSO#:
68118
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 428
2289 Fairview Street
Burlington ON L7R 2E3
Phone: (905) 681-1103
Fax: (905) 681-0052
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Joseph Brant Hospital |
Burlington |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:29 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMEETA JANE LAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 1998 |