THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 11:20:30 AM
Lau, Peter Pui Tak
CPSO#:
68114
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Dec 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
316-280 Spadina Ave
Toronto ON M5T 3A5
Phone: 4162233186
Fax: 6477697456
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Dec 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PETER PUI TAK LAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAU is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 1996 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Dec 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 1996 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2018 |