THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 18:46:31 PM
Law, Calvin How Lim
CPSO#:
68113
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Oct 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
The Edmond Odette Cancer Centre
Suite T2-025
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4825
Fax: (416) 480-5804
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CALVIN HOW LIM LAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAW is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
CF - Surgical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
CF - Surgical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 1999 |