THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 21:13:26 PM
Lee, Christine Hye Chong
CPSO#:
68110
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Jul 1998
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: C.H. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Ave E
Hamilton, ON L8N 4A6
Date Received: 21 May 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:07 Sep 2000 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1998 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2020 |