THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:47:05 AM
Cullen, Nora Kathleen
CPSO#:
68098
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Feb 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Feb 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehab Centre, Hamilton Hea
300 Wellington St N
Hamilton, On
L8L 0A4
Hamilton ON L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 41214
Fax: (905) 577-8233
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:30 Jun 1998 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NORA KATHLEEN CULLEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULLEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1998 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 1999 |