THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 1:54:24 AM
Gardiner, Donald Irwin
CPSO#:
68041
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Nov 1996
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Nov 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
WAYPOINT CENTRE FOR MENTAL HEALTH
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON L0K 1P0
Phone: (705) 549-3181 Ext. 2902
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Georgian Bay General Hospital,Penetanguishene Site |
Penetanguishene |
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care |
Penetanguishene |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:04 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONALD IRWIN GARDINER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARDINER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 1996 |