THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:28:16 AM
Dec, David Allan
CPSO#:
68004
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 1996
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
5400 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON L2G 5X7
Phone: (905) 356-2228
Fax: (905) 356-8161
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Jun 1996 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DAVID ALLAN DEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEC is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 1996 |