THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:41:00 PM
Horak, Martin John
CPSO#:
67984
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
08 Jul 1999
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Jul 1999
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5095
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARTIN JOHN HORAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HORAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1999 |