THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 19:43:28 PM
Koprowicz, Kinga Tatiana
CPSO#:
67967
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1994
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: University of Ottawa, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
525 West St South
unit 1
Orillia ON L3V 5H2
Phone: (705) 2591833
Fax: (705) 2591834
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:15 Dec 1998 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KINGA TATIANA KOPROWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPROWICZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1994 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 1998 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2019 |